ELDON CELTIC JFC

Charity number: 1130441
Charity reporting is overdue by 175 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Total gross income £23.41k £23.89k £24.30k £18.98k £1.40k
Total expenditure £24.61k £23.27k £21.21k £23.21k £1.10k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A