SUNRISE VOLUNTEER PROGRAMMES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunrise Volunteer Programme is is located in Brighton and Hove city on south coast. The idea being that you will visit as volunteers to help us improve the service for the local community. At same time, you will have the real opportunity to involve to Chinese peopleÔÇÖs life and get different experience for your life as well.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- China
Governance
- 28 October 2009: Standard registration
- 04 March 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2014 | 31/05/2015 | 31/05/2016 | 31/05/2017 | 31/05/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.45k | £4.42k | £5.22k | £3.74k | £1.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.03k | £5.89k | £5.22k | £3.73k | £1.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2018 | 17 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 MAY 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 5 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
1. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 LIVING IN THE UK BY PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND ORGANISING VOLUNTEERING PROJECTS FOR THEM OVERSEES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION 2. THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH AND EDUCATION, RELIEF OF NEED AND THE CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND WILDLIFE IN CHINA, OR ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE BY THE PLACEMENT OF TRAINED VOLUNTEERS FOR PROJECTS WHICH ADVANCE THESE OBJECTS."
Area of benefit
THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window