SUTTON COLDFIELD UNITED REFORMED CHURCH

Charity number: 1131424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christine Fursdon Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
Roy Young Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Richard Broughton Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
Patricia Broughton Trustee 01 January 2015 None on record
BARBARA WALLACE MCDOWELL Trustee None on record
Oliver John Stewart Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Rev David Michael Walton Trustee 04 February 2015
THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH (WEST MIDLANDS) TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
Kate Butcher Trustee 01 January 2015 None on record
Lynette Heather Morris Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Sheila Margaret Williams Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Meriel Shotton Trustee 01 January 2015 None on record
Nigel Bean Trustee 01 January 2015 None on record
Barbara Bean Trustee 01 January 2015 None on record
JOHN PREECE Trustee 01 January 2015 None on record
Alan Eaton Trustee 01 January 2012 None on record
Peter Redwood Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record