TRINITY METHODIST CHURCH LOWESTOFT

Charity number: 1130417
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 22 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 19 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 10 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 10 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 22 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 22 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 27 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 27 January 2017 On time Download