TRINITY METHODIST CHURCH LOWESTOFT

Charity number: 1130417
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £125.74k £125.67k £105.07k £132.21k £124.86k
Total expenditure £139.96k £132.15k £116.42k £123.33k £117.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A