Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST MARY AND ST PAUL HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
Charity number: 1130644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Keith Williams | Chair | 01 April 2017 |
|
|||||
ROGER MILTON SYGRAVE | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Opeyemi Olubusola Wilde-Halim | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gabrielle Norma Podmore | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Crawley | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Derek Williams | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Michael Peter Kemp | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosamund Anne Russell BSc MRTPI | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Robin Boardman | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Emmeline Mary Lambert | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Bowes | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Luke Geoghegan | Trustee | 20 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Gaddes | Trustee | 21 April 2014 |
|
|||||
YVONNE ELIZABETH DORAN | Trustee | 18 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROSINA LOUISA Gaddes | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.