Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF NEWCASTLE UNDER LYME (ST GILES') WITH ST THOMAS' BUTTERTON
Charity number: 1130602
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Joshua Penduck | Chair | 06 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Glynn Francis Edwards | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Daley | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anita Elizabeth Gibson | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lawrance Vincent Bailey | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jillian Ruth Griffin | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Joan Taylor | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Collison | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daphne Barbara Collison | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Mckeever | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Rowlands | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dennis George Brammer | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Mary Elks | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PENELOPE ANN RICHARDS | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ARTHUR MADDISON | Trustee | 16 July 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.