Accounts and annual returns WE ARE MUSIC LTD

Charity number: 1130937
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2022 30 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 30 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 29 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 29 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 29 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 02 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 07 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 15 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2018 12 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 28 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window