Financial history WE ARE MUSIC LTD

Charity number: 1130937
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £31.31k £90.72k £45.42k £62.00k £52.11k
Total expenditure £31.54k £48.98k £53.85k £64.44k £55.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £4.40k N/A N/A N/A