Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MAGNUS THE MARTYR WITH ST MARGARET NEW FISH STREET AND ST MICHAEL CROOKED LANE, LONDON

Charity number: 1130590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 30 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 29 August 2017 On time Download Open in new window