Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARNABAS WOODSIDE PARK
Charity number: 1131412
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
27 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Andrew James Sachs | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Isobel Worrell | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Boreham | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Jianbi Chen | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sebastian Cummings | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adeline Selvaraj | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emmanuel Korboe | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Bo Sun | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beth Jolley | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Saffery | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dudley Desmond Dionysius Hanciles | Trustee | 19 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Taylor | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tiani Fernando-Perera | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew Gliddon | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fredy Tirado | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Evelyn Peart | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ola Alabi | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Adrian Clarke | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Oluwatosin Coker | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rinret Leks | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julia Connick | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Troup | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Nunn-Harvey | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jan Kovar | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Uloma Boateng | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev HELEN LOUISE SHANNON | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID JONATHAN VINCENT | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.