Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS' WITH SAINT PETER HUTTON
Charity number: 1132536

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
25 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW SMITH | Chair | 16 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Alice Smith | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Susan Margaret Goldsmith | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE THOMAS | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Peter Thompson Mr | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|||||
David Morten Mr | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Timothy David Barfoot Mr | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Whymark Reverend | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
June Sykes | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tino To | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Clare Stockbridge Bland | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jason Manning | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Frances Annobil | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Yarwood | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Yarwood | Trustee | 14 April 2014 |
|
|||||
Terence John Hayden | Trustee | 14 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Underwood | Trustee | 14 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE PATRICIA BRADFORD | Trustee | 26 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAWN LILIAN WHITE | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARGARET ANN MORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAWN SHAXON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYNN ELIZABETH RAE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev ANTHONY BAXTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN WILLIAM PATTERSON M.I.E.T. | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.