Accounts and annual returns ESSEX ISLAMIC ACADEMY

Charity number: 1131755
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 29 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 29 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 29 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 29 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 26 February 2019 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 February 2019 21 days late Download Open in new window