Financial history ESSEX ISLAMIC ACADEMY

Charity number: 1131755
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £253.50k £139.71k £106.55k £96.61k £177.38k
Total expenditure £343.94k £50.24k £45.07k £92.67k £117.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £11.57k N/A