THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. DAVID'S MORETON-IN-MARSH WITH ST. MARY'S BATSFORD

Charity number: 1131097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £262.72k £300.50k £297.16k £302.31k £285.01k
Total expenditure £254.35k £293.64k £295.21k £276.03k £288.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A