THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. DAVID'S MORETON-IN-MARSH WITH ST. MARY'S BATSFORD

Charity number: 1131097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher John Harris Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
Claire Mason Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
Rev Ian Bentley Trustee 01 June 2018 None on record
Ruth Mary Bentley Trustee 21 October 2020 None on record
James David Alexander Shand Trustee 21 October 2020 None on record
Rev Andrew John Morrison Dow Trustee 06 September 2021 None on record
Michael Harry Payne Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
Margaret Ann Stansbury Trustee 21 October 2020 None on record
Clare Della Peaston Trustee 28 April 2021 None on record
JAMIE AVIS Trustee 30 April 2019
THE JONAS CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Dr Elizabeth Mary Royle Trustee 28 April 2021 None on record
Gareth Williams Trustee 01 April 2012 None on record
Jill Valerie Gordon Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
Max Nicholls Trustee 01 April 2014 None on record
Rev JOHN HENRY CURRAN Trustee 19 July 2021
AFRICA INLAND MISSION INTERNATIONAL Received: On time
THE LONGBOROUGH RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
John Francis Woodall Trustee 21 October 2020 None on record
Steve Adeymo-Phillips Trustee 28 April 2021 None on record
Andrea Clare Paxton Trustee 21 October 2020 None on record