THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW'S, CHORLEYWOOD

Charity number: 1130419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Isabel Joyce Jones Trustee 02 April 2019 None on record
NIGEL CHALLIS Trustee 26 April 2017 None on record
Jackie Gedling Trustee 26 April 2017 None on record
Corinne Williamson Trustee 14 October 2020
CHURCH IN THE SWILLETT Received: On time
Tanitha Wait Trustee 14 October 2020 None on record
LES PALMER Trustee 14 May 2012 None on record
Rev Tim Horlock Chair 09 November 2016 None on record
William Trevor Seddon Trustee
THE NORTHUMBRIA COMMUNITY TRUST Received: On time
THE WILLIAM LEECH FOUNDATION LIMITED Received: On time
THE QUEEN VICTORIA CLERGY FUND Received: On time
Bill Harer Trustee 02 April 2019 None on record
Jonathan Logan Trustee 02 April 2019 None on record
Philip Barton Trustee 14 October 2020 None on record
Matthew Jones Trustee 14 October 2020 None on record
Adeola Oludemi Trustee 27 April 2016
DAME AGNES WESTON'S ROYAL CHARITY FOR THE NAVAL SERVICE Received: On time
THE HEBE FOUNDATION (SOUTH LONDON) Received: On time
JUDITH PALFREMAN Trustee
CHENIES SCHOOL FUND Received: On time
SHORTENILLS ENVIRONMENTAL EDUCATION TRUST Overdue by 916 days
Benjamin John Trustee 02 April 2019 None on record
John Ford Trustee 01 May 2013
OPPORTUNITY INTERNATIONAL UNITED KINGDOM Received: On time
THE ALLIGATOR TRUST Received: On time
JANDSFORD TRUST Received: On time
OPPORTUNITY MICROFINANCE INVESTMENTS LIMITED Received: On time
WATFORD NEW HOPE TRUST Received: On time
Michael Geoffrey Thompson Trustee 05 May 2021
HAGGAI ADVANCED LEADERSHIP TRAINING LIMITED Received: On time
CATHERINE HARER Trustee 06 May 2012 None on record