ORRELL HOLGATE PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT, STAFF AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1130184
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £8.26k £9.40k £8.85k £8.04k £4.04k
Total expenditure £8.19k £6.80k £2.13k £1.61k £4.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A