Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LUKE, WATFORD
Charity number: 1130376
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Michael John Norman | Chair | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Colin Davies | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip James Matthews | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Francis Trundle | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wera L Irvine | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
MELANIE JANE SILLS | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Catherine Craigie | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin James Donald Kirk | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Ann Reynolds | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Modupe Fasanya | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Jane Llewellyn | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Dean Charles Tearle | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Robert William Harvey | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Waddington | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Hilda MacLeod | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mave Clarke | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Williamson | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cynthia Mary Bowen | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Miller | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Wendy Somerville | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVE CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.