THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF YATTON MOOR

Charity number: 1132177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £225.13k £225.12k £236.14k £280.98k £216.80k
Total expenditure £221.12k £205.65k £241.96k £264.46k £206.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.84k £0 £8.46k £7.43k £9.49k