GAINSBOROUGH ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND LTD

Charity number: 1130827
Charity reporting is up to date (53 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £186.26k £167.10k £128.72k £109.63k £121.47k
Total expenditure £184.76k £188.11k £141.29k £124.95k £147.57k
Income from government contracts £20.00k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £15.00k £15.00k £15.00k £15.00k £15.00k