AVENUE ST ANDREW'S SOUTHAMPTON UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY

Charity number: 1130504
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £109.59k £142.73k £113.40k £237.91k £156.56k
Total expenditure £124.05k £121.74k £119.44k £295.06k £206.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A