AVENUE ST ANDREW'S SOUTHAMPTON UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY

Charity number: 1130504
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Edward Howard Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
Susan Valerie Wallingford Trustee 01 January 2018
H B LANKESTER CHARITIES IN CONNEXION WITH AVENUE CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH Received: On time
THE CHAPEL HOUSE CHARITY Received: On time
THE BURNETT AND ANDERSON TRUST Received: On time
David Frederick John Baker Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
Roger John Dymoke Howard Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
JOAN ELIZABETH MACDONALD MCGAVIN Trustee 01 January 2014 None on record
Susanne Dawson Trustee 01 January 2015
THE BURNETT AND ANDERSON TRUST Received: On time