Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BRAINTREE ST MICHAEL
Charity number: 1132702

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Nigel Charles Adams | Chair | 24 August 2017 |
|
|||||
Rachel Huxter | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER BAILEY | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Adam Grove Smith | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Rose Kinniburgh | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Derek Chapman | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Marsh | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Terence Cooke | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peggy Jacqueline Wills | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Grove Smith | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ade Odupitan | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Daniel Bostock Hollis | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cyril Bernard Bamforth | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY DAVEY | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David William Marriott | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN HUXTER | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|||||
MRS LIN TERRIS | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.