POINTMAN LEADERSHIP UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of education and community development worldwide, particularly in relation to the provision of ethical leadership training. Training is delivered in character-based principles leadership to organisations, senior civil servants, senior police officials and senior government officials. It also provides volunteer resource to Pointman Leadership Institute.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Afghanistan
- Albania
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Argentina
- Armenia
- Belgium
- Bolivia
- Brazil
- Bulgaria
- Burundi
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- China
- Colombia
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Costa Rica
- Czech Republic
- Dominican Republic
- El Salvador
- Estonia
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- Germany
- Grenada
- Guatemala
- Hungary
- India
- Isle Of Man
- Jamaica
- Jordan
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Latvia
- Liberia
- Lithuania
- Malawi
- Mexico
- Mongolia
- Montenegro
- Netherlands
- Nigeria
- Panama
- Papua New Guinea
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Romania
- Russia
- Samoa
- Serbia
- South Africa
- Sudan
- Suriname
- Switzerland
- The Bahamas
- Tonga
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- United States
- Uruguay
- Vanuatu
- Venezuela
- Vietnam
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 18 December 2009: Standard registration
- POINTMAN LEADERSHIP INSTITUTE (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL CRAIG ASKEW | Chair |
|
|
|||||
NEIL DICKSON COLLIN | Trustee | 04 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL PETER BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR DON AXCELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD JAMES WIGGINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.52k | £3.14k | £3.39k | £3.35k | £15.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.05k | £567 | £370 | £7.12k | £12.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 APRIL 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 16 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ETHICAL STANDARDS OF CONDUCT IN LEADERSHIP, ANTI-CORRUPTION MEASURES AND THE PREVENTION AND ELIMINATION OF CORRUPTION (THE 'OBJECT').
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, INTERNATIONALLY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
67 UPPER SELSDON ROAD
SOUTH CROYDON
CR2 8DJ
- Phone:
- 01292470082
- Email:
- pointmanuk@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window