PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TONG AND LAISTERDYKE

Charity number: 1130777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Liam James Jagger Trustee 18 April 2016
BRADFORD COLLEGE STUDENTS' UNION
Amanda Joy Appleyard Trustee 09 April 2019 None on record
Rev GARY STUART HODGSON Chair 18 April 2016
PRIMETIME AT THE VINE Received: On time
ST CHRISTOPHER'S FAMILY CENTRE Received: On time
Paul Coates-Black Trustee 17 April 2018 None on record
Rev HELEN MARY HODGSON Trustee 18 April 2016
Step 2 Young People's Health Received: On time
JESUS SHAPED PEOPLE Received: On time
JOYCE ASTBURY Trustee 18 April 2016 None on record
Elaine Amelia Rathmell BEM Trustee 09 April 2019 None on record
Jean Black Trustee 25 November 2014 None on record
Andy Sykes Trustee 25 November 2014 None on record
Angela Abson Trustee 09 April 2019 None on record
Philippa Slingsby Trustee 01 July 2018 None on record
John Rathmell Trustee 09 April 2019 None on record
LOUISE MARY CONNACHER Trustee 20 April 2015 None on record
Margaret Mary Ealham Trustee 25 November 2014 None on record