Financial history Refugee Education UK

Charity number: 1132509
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £352.53k £474.87k £673.15k £1.42m £1.66m
Total expenditure £311.57k £390.61k £578.12k £807.01k £1.64m
Income from government contracts N/A £5.21k £9.08k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £12.50k £152.59k £388.59k £208.20k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £628.31k £1.35m £1.63m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £68.58k £32.98k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £32.80k £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £12.04k £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £7.26k £761
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £578.12k £804.21k £1.63m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £2.80k £3.41k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £25.82k £2.50k £112.30k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0