Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF NOTTINGHAM SAINT PETER AND ALL SAINTS
Charity number: 1130298
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev CHRISTOPHER HARRISON | Chair |
|
||||||||||
Keith Mountford | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
John Henry Burr | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
HEATHER JANE HENSON | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
David John Fines | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rachel Elizabeth Dyer-Williams | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Chigozie NWACHUKWU | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Patricia Anne Coy | Trustee | 07 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Resil Jarrett | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Dorothy Elizabeth Mountford | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|||||||||
CATHRYN ANNE VINDELIS | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
DAVID JOHN TOWERS | Trustee | 21 April 2011 |
|
|||||||||
REV Richard Davey BA Hons BTh Hons PhD | Trustee | 01 November 2010 |
|
|
||||||||
ROBERT WILLIAM EDLIN - WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Lorraine Smedley | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
PETER RUSSELL MOORE FCA | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.