Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW, MAGHULL, LIVERPOOL

Charity number: 1134643
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 10 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 November 2020 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 November 2020 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 12 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 04 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window