Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW, MAGHULL, LIVERPOOL

Charity number: 1134643
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Simon Mark Elliott BA, BTh Chair 19 May 2021
None on record
Hazel Mattinson Trustee 05 May 2022
None on record
Charlotte Jade Scott Trustee 05 May 2022
None on record
Joshua David Fowell Trustee 05 May 2022
None on record
Philip Pimblett Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Norma Pimblett Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Elaine Entwistle Trustee 08 June 2021
None on record
James Entwistle Trustee 08 June 2021
None on record
Gillian Grace Trustee 22 May 2019
ANCIENT MAGHULL CHAPEL TRUST
Received: On time
Alison Elizabeth Crawford Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Dan Hugo Trustee 02 April 2017
None on record
BRUCE LOCK HUBBARD Trustee 06 April 2014
THE ROTARY CLUB OF MAGHULL & AUGHTON TRUST FUND
Received: On time
SEFTON NORTH DEANERY
Received: On time
KAREN ILSA BLANCHARD Trustee 17 April 2012
None on record
Helen Fawcett Trustee
MAGHULL PARISH INSTITUTE
Received: On time
THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION-COUNTY OF SEFTON
Received: On time
ANCIENT MAGHULL CHAPEL TRUST
Received: On time
DAVID KENNETH SHERMAN BA HONS Trustee
THE GETTALIFE PROJECT
Received: On time
CLAIRE ELIZABETH SHERMAN BA HONS Trustee
THE GETTALIFE PROJECT
Received: On time
MR GEOFF WALKER MBCS CITP Trustee
None on record
PATRICIA MARGARET HUGO Trustee
None on record