Accounts and annual returns OUR SANSAR LIMITED

Charity number: 1132124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 01 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 01 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 21 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 21 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 11 February 2019 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 11 February 2019 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 24 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 24 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window