Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CHRISTOPHER AND ST NICHOLAS BLACKPOOL
Charity number: 1130654
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev LEE MARTIN DANIELS | Chair | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ian Rushton | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Roy Anderson | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Milner | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Barlow | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharron Dooley | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Colin Lonsdale | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ENID NUTLAND | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Russell Sargeant | Trustee | 12 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Colin Taylor | Trustee | 12 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Susan Charlton | Trustee | 12 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHARMAINE ROBSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.