KENNET AND TEST VALLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1132306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £217.54k £267.78k £338.57k £213.22k £314.15k
Total expenditure £223.44k £234.28k £338.73k £244.28k £264.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A