KENNET AND TEST VALLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1132306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

35 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDREW JOHN BILLINGTON Trustee None on record
Helen Batterby Trustee 15 September 2021 None on record
STEPHEN PAUL GREENHALGH Trustee None on record
CHRISTINE THOMAS Trustee None on record
HELEN MARY COOK Trustee 15 January 2012 None on record
HOWARD FLETCHER Trustee 15 January 2012 None on record
MARGARET ELAINE FLETCHER Trustee None on record
Jennifer Anne Juniper Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
Rev JENNIFER MARGARET ELLIS Trustee None on record
Tandy Elizabeth Davies Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
BARRY JOHN JACKMAN Trustee 26 July 2013
THE KINGFISHER TRUST 2014 Received: On time
Jeanette Louise Smith Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
DORIS LILIAN VAUGHAN Trustee None on record
REVD DR PETER JAMES HOWSON BSc MA MBA Trustee 16 January 2016
THE SOCIETY FOR ARMY HISTORICAL RESEARCH Received: On time
Judith Ann Mitchell Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record
RICHARD JOHN KELLY Trustee 16 January 2016 None on record
Janet Woodward Trustee 01 September 2015 None on record
Rev Andrew David Fitchet Trustee 01 September 2019
AFFIRM: BAPTISTS TOGETHER FOR LGBT+ INCLUSION Received: On time
REVD PETER JOHN BENNETT Trustee 01 September 2015 None on record
Julia Ruth Mundin Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
Roy Batterby Trustee 15 September 2021 None on record
STUART JAMES ARMSTRONG Trustee 26 January 2017
THATCHAM UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE Received: On time
DAVID BEN VAUGHAN Trustee None on record
Raymond Hoyle Trustee 01 September 2018
KINTBURY VOLUNTEER GROUP Received: On time
PIED PIPER PRE-SCHOOL Received: On time
HELEN ELIZABETH MEHAFFEY Trustee 26 July 2013 None on record
JENNIFER MARY BARTTER Trustee None on record
CONSTANCE JANICE SCHOFIELD Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
Karen Anne Frost Trustee 01 September 2018
WEST BERKS FOODBANK Received: On time
Mary Armstrong Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
ALISON MARGARET HUTCHINS Trustee None on record
JOHN WATERER Trustee
THE KINGFISHER TRUST 2014 Received: On time
Joan Rosemary Greenhalgh Trustee 21 January 2014 None on record
HELEN MITCHELL WATSON Trustee 01 September 2015 None on record
Joanne Lesley Murray Trustee 15 September 2021 None on record
Rev RACHEL JANE BORGARS Chair 01 September 2016
SOUTHAMPTON METHODIST DISTRICT Received: On time