Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF NORTON

Charity number: 1131971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Trevor Andrew Sharp Chair 24 July 2017
THE ST NICHOLAS CHURCH NORTON PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
Victoria Ruth Cameron Trustee 28 October 2020
None on record
Laura Helene Hill Trustee 28 October 2020
None on record
Claire Louise Harald Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record
Angela Mae Caldwell Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record
Jane Elizabeth Munford Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
ROSAMUND CLARE PRATT Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
Timothy Richard Croot Trustee 17 April 2016
None on record
Susan Mary Taylor Trustee 13 May 2015
PEREGRINE RECORDER ORCHESTRA
Received: On time
PATRICIA MARION TIMMS Trustee 13 May 2015
None on record
Michael Anthony Forrester Trustee 10 September 2014
None on record
Olive Agnes Greatorex Trustee 02 April 2014
None on record
KAREN PATRICIA WILLIAMS Trustee
None on record
FIONA ELIZABETH EVE Trustee
None on record
NEIL GREATOREX Trustee
None on record
KEITH EDWARD TAYLOR Trustee
None on record