Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JAMES, TAUNTON
Charity number: 1130757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Fabian Rene Marc Wuyts | Chair | 14 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Johannes Smit | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Margaret Hope | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Irene Jones | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Derek Bright | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin Alan Bluemel | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vashti Wuyts Smit | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Thomas Jordan | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Dorothy Gibson | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Rickard | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Phyllis Lucas | Trustee | 13 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Nicholas David Tall | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Joyce Kirk | Trustee | 13 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD SAINSBURY | Trustee | 02 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROGER IAN FENTON | Trustee | 02 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER GERTRUDE ELIZABETH WAKEFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD MARTIN CARPENTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN PERCIVAL WAKEFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.