Financial history HAYDON BRIDGE AND HAYDON PARISH DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1135248
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £18.63k £19.37k £15.42k £17.12k £14.02k
Total expenditure £17.30k £16.61k £26.08k £14.21k £15.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k N/A