THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, SHORTLANDS

Charity number: 1130802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 December 2019 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 20 December 2019 50 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 27 March 2017 On time Download