THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, SHORTLANDS

Charity number: 1130802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021

Total income: £226,947
Total expenditure: £202,049

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bromley

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • PARISH CHURCH OF ST MARY, SHORTLANDS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Lesley Kustner Trustee 01 June 2022
None on record
Dr Pauline Jessica Lambourne Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Rachel Tillotson Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
Sue Slaney Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
Catherine Bingham Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
Gloria Sherman Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Catherine Louise Buchanan Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Janet Boam Trustee 19 March 2017
None on record
KEITH MILLS Trustee 27 April 2014
MARY MACARTHUR HOLIDAY TRUST
Received: On time
ROBIN HOGG Trustee 27 April 2014
None on record
Dr DAVID BARRINGTON JEFFERYS Trustee 08 February 2013
THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES GENERAL CHARITY LIMITED
Received: On time
FACULTY OF THE HISTORY OF MEDICINE AND PHARMACY OF THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES OF LONDON
Received: On time
FACULTY OF CONFLICT AND CATASTROPHE MEDICINE OF THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES OF LONDON
Received: On time
Professor Mark Fox Trustee 29 April 2012
None on record
ANN-MARIE JEFFERYS Trustee 29 April 2009
GUILD OF FREEMEN OF THE CITY OF LONDON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
FRANCON TRUST
Received: On time
Julie Fox Trustee 29 April 2009
ST GEORGE THE MARTYR CHARITY
Received: On time
PATRICIA CHASE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £189.43k £192.53k £253.41k £261.73k £226.95k
Total expenditure £181.43k £186.26k £189.75k £198.21k £202.05k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 24 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 December 2019 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 20 December 2019 50 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Marys Church House
St. Marys Avenue
BROMLEY
BR2 0PU
Phone:
02084605884