Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SKEGNESS AND WINTHORPE IN THE DIOCESE OF LINCOLN

Charity number: 1131268
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Richard Gary HOLDEN Chair 15 September 2016
None on record
Patricia Sheen Trustee 19 March 2019
None on record
James Warren Trustee 19 March 2019
None on record
Brian Derek Mundy Trustee 19 March 2019
None on record
Alan WHITE Trustee 26 April 2018
None on record
DAVID THOMAS HEDGES Trustee 25 April 2016
None on record
Jean Smith Trustee 20 April 2015
None on record
Stewart WHITEHEAD Trustee 22 May 2013
None on record
June Anne CLINGAN Trustee 03 June 2012
LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF SKEGNESS HOSPITAL
Received: On time
Angela Diana BAXTER Trustee 03 June 2012
None on record
Rosemary Jane Hambleton SHARP Trustee 26 July 2011
None on record
LINDA HARWOOD Trustee 26 July 2011
None on record
Rev Christine ANDERSON Trustee
None on record
MARGARET JUNE JARVIS Trustee
None on record