Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL HIGHGATE
Charity number: 1130913
Charity reporting is overdue by 171 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alex Lehmann | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Casson | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Holtby | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hanaan Marwah | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mike Powell | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Megan Clark | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Virginia West | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Andrew George CLODE | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Alexander Timothy Matthew Ollier | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Brading | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARK LAWRENCE DAILEY | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Charles Edwin JANDREAU | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
OLAKUNLE AYODELE AYODEJI | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Simon Owen | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Julia Rigby | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR Karen Sennett FRCGP | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ms Patrice Ware-White | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM JOHN MCGREGOR | Trustee | 24 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
REV JOHN HOWARD PICTON ROGERS | Trustee | 30 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS FRANCIS WALEY SANDERSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.