THE LODDON VALLEY DAY CARE (RESPITE) CENTRE

Charity number: 1131640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 April 2021 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 April 2021 71 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 January 2018 On time Download