THE LODDON VALLEY DAY CARE (RESPITE) CENTRE

Charity number: 1131640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £30.03k £41.25k £38.11k £44.91k £42.18k
Total expenditure £39.77k £39.89k £39.80k £42.77k £35.03k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £2.96k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £6.52k