Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF PITSEA WITH NEVENDON
Charity number: 1131085

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev SIMON ANTHONY LAW | Chair | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Ellaway | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Tony Houghton | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
PAUL DICKER | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Margaret WOODWARD | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Hayden | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Vivian Norma Simpson | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JACQUI MOSS | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Norman Hiscock | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ELIZABETH LAW | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA HISCOCK | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE SANDRA RIDLER | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
INGRID DOROTHY DOGGETT | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PATRICK RIDLER | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
DOREEN MARGARET FAIRMAN | Trustee | 23 March 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.