STANDING ON THE SHOULDERS OF GIANTS THEATRE COMPANY LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is built on two beliefs: the enduring relevance of the classics and the creative energy to be found in Britain's diverse communities. It brings classic stories up to date, re-thinking them and creating original pieces of theatre, performed by professional actors and inspired by, and relevant to, specific community groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 25 March 2010: Standard registration
- GIANTS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Cordelia Yates | Trustee | 14 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dionne Buckman | Trustee | 14 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Susan Draper | Trustee | 14 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.67k | £1.17k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.69k | £21.06k | £5 | £240 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 19 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 09 December 2020 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 08 JUNE 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC BY DEVELOPING AND STAGING EVENTS THAT ENCOURAGE COMMUNITY COHESION.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRADBURY STUDIOS
138 KINGSLAND ROAD
LONDON
E2 8DY
- Phone:
- 07939721180
- Email:
- info@giantstheatre.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window