THE PAROCHIAL COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETERS,TUNBRIDGE WELLS

Charity number: 1131548
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £132.85k £113.89k £124.97k £138.43k £143.80k
Total expenditure £128.14k £101.77k £144.42k £151.10k £135.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A