Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PHILIP & ST JAMES CHATHAM

Charity number: 1130600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev ANDREW VAUGHAN Chair 14 February 2021
None on record
JOHN EDWARD CROOK Trustee 08 May 2021
None on record
WINSTON ARCHIBALD Trustee 08 May 2021
None on record
Tanya Terry Trustee 08 May 2021
None on record
TRACY JANE READ Trustee 10 October 2020
MEDWAY PUZZLES
Recently registered
MEDWAY NIGHT SHELTER
Received: On time
Steve Fouch Trustee 10 October 2020
PARISH NURSING MINISTRIES UK
Received: On time
MARY BURLING Trustee 10 October 2020
None on record
TREVOR POULTER Trustee 10 October 2020
None on record
DIANE HATCHER Trustee 10 October 2020
None on record
HEATHER ANNE DREW Trustee 10 October 2020
None on record
Tandy Sinclair Trustee 30 April 2019
None on record
LUKE SAUNDERS Trustee 14 April 2019
None on record
RITA HOLDING Trustee 14 April 2019
None on record
MR GUY GALLICO Trustee 01 August 2018
None on record
ROSE ROBINSON Trustee 19 April 2017
None on record
Rev MARTYN LEONARD JOHN SAUNDERS Trustee
ELIZABETH PETTY
Received: On time
BISHOP OF ROCHESTERS FUND FOR MISSION
Received: On time
THE NET COMMUNITY HUB
Received: On time
SIR EDMUND GREGORY SAMSON BURFORD ALFRED MANNERINGS KEMSLEY CHATHAM SICK POOR FUND
Received: On time
THE ROCHESTER DIOCESAN SOCIETY AND BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time