THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BOTOLPH'S, LONGTHORPE

Charity number: 1131670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
EDWINA MILLER Trustee 23 May 2016 None on record
MRS PATRICIA HOPE-JONES Trustee 29 April 2014 None on record
Robert William Noyes Trustee 27 May 2021 None on record
Michael John Taylor Trustee 11 April 2019
THE LONGTHORPE VILLAGE WAR MEMORIAL FUND Received: On time
CORINNE ANGELA HARWOOD CRAYMER Trustee 30 April 2013 None on record
JONATHAN GEOFFREY CRAYMER Trustee 17 May 2017 None on record
Alyson Louise Mitchell Trustee 27 May 2021 None on record
Michael John Sampson Trustee 11 April 2019 None on record
YVETTE VALERIE MAGRI Trustee 29 April 2014 None on record
REV JACKIE BULLEN Chair 01 April 2017 None on record
Timothy Bruce Ellingham Trustee 11 April 2019 None on record
DAPHNE MAIR Trustee 25 April 2017 None on record
MR CHRIS WREN Trustee 21 April 2015 None on record
Elizabeth Medlock Trustee 27 May 2021 None on record
MRS PAT HEMSLEY Trustee 21 April 2015 None on record
Julie Ann Tate Trustee 27 May 2021 None on record
Rowena Margaret Sampson Trustee 11 April 2019 None on record