DESTINY CHURCH NEWCASTLE

Charity number: 1134332
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £52.73k £52.73k £50.77k £81.43k £88.34k
Total expenditure £51.56k £51.56k £51.02k £50.68k £66.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A