THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CAMBRIDGE ST. BARNABAS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities under the Church of England, Diocese of Ely.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £10,447 from 2 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 10 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST. BARNABAS PCC, CAMBRIDGE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Philip Irons | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|||||
DAVID HUNT | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Whiffen | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Denise Roland | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Morrison | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Jordon | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Makower | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Blake | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adriana Dandu | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Middleton | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ivan Joseph Wilmore | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tabitha Schieferdecker | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Rowley | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Timothy Smith | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £443.38k | £429.52k | £407.34k | £398.83k | £395.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £444.92k | £435.49k | £392.98k | £416.90k | £409.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.82k | N/A | N/A | £10.45k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 November 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 November 2022 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Barnabas Church
Mill Road
CAMBRIDGE
CB1 2BD
- Phone:
- 01223519526
- Email:
- office@stbs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window